ALTUS CAPITAL LIMITED 浩德融資有限公司
SFC licensees
RO=Responsible Officer, Rep=Representative
Name | Age in 2017 |
⚥ | Role | From | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Chan, Tin Wa Caesar 陳天華 | Rep | 2017-06-08 | 2019-01-21 | ||
2 | Chang, Sean Pey 曾憲沛 | 46 | M | RO | ||
3 | Chau, Helen Hoi Man 周凱汶 | F | Rep | 2017-07-27 | 2021-06-25 | |
4 | Cheung, Caroline Chung Man 張頌敏 | F | Rep | 2011-04-11 | 2018-04-10 | |
5 | Ding, Zhen (SFC:BLR088) 丁楨 | Rep | 2017-12-05 | 2020-11-28 | ||
6 | Ho, Samantha Shuk Yee 何淑懿 | 53 | F | RO | 2014-07-11 | |
7 | Ip, Arnold Tin Chee 葉天賜 | 55 | M | RO | ||
8 | Khoo, Charlotte Wing Pui 邱詠培 | 28 | F | RO | 2016-09-29 | |
9 | Kwok, Ka Kit 郭家傑 | Rep | 2016-08-19 | 2020-11-11 | ||
10 | Lee, Clement Lok Hin 李洛軒 | M | Rep | 2016-08-23 | 2019-01-04 | |
11 | Leung, Hiu Yan (SFC:BHZ868) 梁曉欣 | Rep | 2016-08-23 | 2018-12-14 | ||
12 | Leung, Jeanny Churk Yin 梁綽然 | 53 | F | RO | 2015-07-23 | |
13 | Li, Yee Sing 李怡昇 | Rep | 2016-01-26 | 2022-09-01 | ||
14 | Ooi, Boon Sing 黃文星 | Rep | 2016-12-23 | 2018-08-28 | ||
15 | Preston, Archibald Joseph 賴奇柏 | M | Rep | 2014-06-18 | 2018-03-09 | |
16 | Tam, Leo Ho Kei 譚浩基 | 32 | M | Rep | 2014-11-03 | 2018-02-26 |
17 | Wong, Evelyn (SFC:BHE169) 黃彥慈 | Rep | 2016-03-23 | 2018-05-31 | ||
18 | Ye, Weilong (SFC:BHW508) 叶偉龍 | Rep | 2016-07-27 | 2019-01-31 | ||
19 | Zheng, Zuer 鄭祖儿 | Rep | 2016-11-17 | 2018-01-28 |
Sign up for our free newsletter
Recommend Webb-site to a friend
Copyright & disclaimer, Privacy policy