LOTHIAN LIMITED (d2017-02-07)
Main board
Name | ⚥ | Age in 2024 |
Position | From | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Averill, Michael Charles Edward | M | 73 | DirDirector | 1998-03-12 | 2007-09-30 |
2 | Bellingham, Henry Campbell | M | 69 | DirDirector | 1998-03-12 | |
3 | Brown, Colin Andrew (1955-05) | M | 69 | DirDirector | 1998-03-12 | 2004-05-14 |
4 | Cartwright, Robert Ian | M | 69 | DirDirector | 2007-11-05 | 2017-02-07 |
5 | Downes, David John (1945-12) | M | 79 | DirDirector | 1998-03-12 | 2005-12-31 |
6 | Griffin-Smith, Philip Bernard | M | 58 | DirDirector | 2015-10-06 | 2017-02-07 |
7 | Rabl, Preston Martin Charles | M | 75 | DirDirector | 1998-03-12 | |
8 | Romanes, John Lauder | M | 101 | DirDirector | 1998-03-12 | |
9 | Saunders, Mark Ian (1968-06) | M | 56 | DirDirector | 2009-12-03 | 2011-07-31 |
DirDirector | 2009-12-03 | 2009-12-03 | ||||
10 | Simpson, Jeremy John Cobbett | M | 53 | DirDirector | 2011-08-01 | 2014-03-31 |
11 | Surch, Christopher | M | 63 | DirDirector | 2009-05-01 | 2012-08-26 |
12 | Welham, Fraser Andrew Norton | M | 60 | DirDirector | 2006-01-01 | 2009-05-27 |
13 | Woolrych, Toby Richard | M | 58 | DirDirector | 2012-08-27 | 2015-10-06 |
Sign up for our free newsletter
Recommend Webb-site to a friend
Copyright & disclaimer, Privacy policy