HEALTH SCREEN FIRST LIMITED
Main board
Name | ⚥ | Age in 2024 |
Position | From | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Charig, Mark Julian | M | 67 | DirDirector | 2006-02-01 | 2013-12-23 |
2 | Evans, David Richard (1972-03) | M | 52 | DirDirector | 2007-03-16 | 2008-05-31 |
3 | Francis, Geoffrey Charles | M | 65 | DirDirector | 2008-02-01 | 2011-05-31 |
4 | Highett-Smith, Paul Robert | M | 79 | DirDirector | 2003-02-27 | 2014-10-14 |
5 | Holman, Derrick Stanley | M | 71 | DirDirector | 2004-07-12 | 2006-01-01 |
6 | Marshall, Sarah Jane (1964-10) | F | 60 | DirDirector | 2008-06-09 | 2013-12-23 |
7 | McGirr, Brian Patrick | M | 61 | DirDirector | 2006-04-01 | 2013-12-23 |
8 | Sheahan, Phillip | M | 77 | DirDirector | 2004-06-29 | 2013-12-23 |
9 | Walters, Frank (1956-09) | M | 68 | DirDirector | 2003-03-03 | 2004-03-30 |
Sign up for our free newsletter
Recommend Webb-site to a friend
Copyright & disclaimer, Privacy policy