Trinick, Christopher John
Main board
Organisation | Position | From | Until | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | EDGE HILL EDUCATION LIMITED | DirDirector | 2011-02-14 | 2012-07-03 | |
2 | EDGE HILL ENTERPRISES LIMITED | DirDirector | 2011-09-28 | 2012-10-15 | |
3 | EDGE HILL LRC LIMITED | DirDirector | 2011-09-28 | 2012-10-15 | |
4 | EDGE HILL MAINTENANCE SERVICES LIMITED | DirDirector | 2011-09-28 | 2012-10-15 | |
5 | EDGE HILL PROPERTY SERVICES LIMITED | DirDirector | 2011-09-28 | 2012-10-15 | |
6 | EDGE HILL UNIVERSITY SCIENCE LIMITED | DirDirector | 2011-09-28 | 2012-10-15 | |
7 | EDGE HILL WESTERN CAMPUS DEVELOPMENTS LIMITED | DirDirector | 2011-09-28 | 2012-10-15 | |
8 | GROWTH LANCASHIRE LIMITED | DirDirector | 2005-07-12 | 2006-11-20 | |
9 | TMLS LIMITED | DirDirector | 2008-06-24 | 2011-11-08 | |
10 | WEST MIDLANDS EXAMINATIONS BOARD(THE) | DirDirector | 1996-03-03 |
Some data are hidden to fit your display. Rotate?
Sign up for our free newsletter
Recommend Webb-site to a friend
Copyright & disclaimer, Privacy policy