Page, Graham John
Main board
Organisation | Position | From | Until | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | BARGAIN BUYS STAPLEFORD LIMITED | DirDirector | 2024-03-28 | ||
2 | BARGAIN BUYS SWINDON LIMITED | DirDirector | 2024-03-28 | ||
3 | BDO EMPLOYMENT SERVICES LIMITED | DirDirector | 1999-02-23 | 2003-03-31 | |
4 | BLANKNEY ESTATES LIMITED | DirDirector | 2012-05-01 | ||
5 | CCG TOPCO LIMITED | DirDirector | 2024-03-28 | ||
6 | CCPD LIMITED | DirDirector | 2007-12-10 | 2022-08-16 | |
7 | CROWN CREST (LEICESTER) LIMITED | DirDirector | 2005-08-01 | ||
8 | CROWN CREST GROUP LIMITED | DirDirector | 2006-02-07 | ||
9 | INSTORE LIMITED | DirDirector | 2024-03-28 | ||
10 | INTERNATIONAL FOOD CONNECTION LTD | DirDirector | 2008-07-01 | 2017-12-07 | |
11 | KEN READ & SON LIMITED | DirDirector | 2005-04-04 | 2008-03-26 | |
12 | LEVELBRAND LIMITED | DirDirector | 2005-10-27 | 2017-09-05 | |
13 | MODERN MARKET RETAILING LIMITED | DirDirector | 2024-03-28 | ||
14 | MOSAIC 1898 LTD | DirDirector | 1993-10-05 | 2000-09-30 | |
15 | SEAHAM INVESTMENTS LIMITED | DirDirector | 2007-05-16 | ||
16 | TRISON ESTATES LIMITED | DirDirector | 2024-03-28 | ||
17 | TRISON ESTATES TOPCO LIMITED | DirDirector | 2024-03-28 |
Some data are hidden to fit your display. Rotate?
Sign up for our free newsletter
Recommend Webb-site to a friend
Copyright & disclaimer, Privacy policy